EP1102399 - Method and apparatus for filtering measurements used in a generalised positioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Syrjärinne, Jari Yliopistonkatu, 45K 115 33500 Tampere / FI | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309542.9 | 30.10.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | US19990444880 | 22.11.1999 Original published format: US 444880 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1102399 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1102399 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03H17/02, G01S1/04 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
G01S19/39 (EP,US);
G01S19/46 (EP,US);
H03H17/0257 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/21] | H03H17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Filterung von Messungen in einem verallgemeinerten Positionierungssystem | [2001/21] | English: | Method and apparatus for filtering measurements used in a generalised positioning system | [2001/21] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le filtrage des mesures utilisées dans un système de positionnement généralisé | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/33] | 10.07.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.08.2006 | 10.07.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.08.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP06115708.7 / EP1744454 | Request for further processing for: | 18.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5883595 (COLLEY JAIME B [US]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-20; | [YA]US5890068 (FATTOUCHE MICHEL T [CA], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 47 * * claims 19-21 *[A] 2-20 |