EP1097822 - Stencil printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riso Kagaku Corporation 2-20-15, Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states RISO KAGAKU CORPORATION 2-20-15, Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawabe, Takao, Riso Kagaku Corporation R & D Cent. 1339-2 Wakaguri Nishikanda, Ami-Machi Inashiki-Gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309687.2 | 02.11.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | JP19990312584 | 02.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31258499 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097822 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097822 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41L13/10 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
B41L13/10 (EP,US);
B41P2227/43 (EP,US);
Y10S101/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/05] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schablonendruckmaschine | [2001/19] | English: | Stencil printing machine | [2001/19] | French: | Machine d'impression au pochoir | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 17.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE476600 (ROTO UND DEBEGO WERKE KOMM GES); | [A]US3311052 (GUSTAV ZEUTHEN KARL); | [A]US5660107 (TAKAHASHI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) |