EP1098397 - Equipment direct-mounting type shield electric connector assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Shigeo, Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. Nunobikibara, Haibara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Ishizaki, Kazuhisa, Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. Nunobikibara, Haibara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309854.8 | 03.11.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | JP19990316662 | 08.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31666299 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098397 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098397 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/436, H01R13/658 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
H01R13/4367 (EP,US);
H01R13/6593 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/05] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbinderanordnung mit Abschirmung zur unmittelbaren Befestigung an Geräte | [2001/19] | English: | Equipment direct-mounting type shield electric connector assembly | [2001/19] | French: | Ensemble connecteur électrique à blindage directement attaché à un appareil | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 21.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.02.2003 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]JPH07282891 ; | [AD]JPH0864306 ; | [AD]JPH07245153 ; | [Y]US4236779 (TANG PAUL R) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 65 - column 8, line 16; figure 4 *; | [Y]US4310211 (BUNNELL EDWARD D, et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 36; figure - * | [YDA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07282891 A 19951027 (YAZAKI CORP) [YD] 2 * abstract * [A] 5,6 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08064306 A 19960308 (YAZAKI CORP) [AD] 1 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 01, & JP07245153 A 19950919 (YAZAKI CORP;OTHERS: 01) [AD] 5,6 * abstract * |