EP1099666 - Method for separating hydrogen chloride and water from an aqueous hydrogen chloride solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuta, Tetsuya 1-5-111, Wakamizu-cho Niihama-shi, Ehime / JP | 02 /
Iwanaga, Kiyoshi 741, Shiinazaki-cho, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/20] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00309943.9 | 09.11.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | JP19990319507 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31950799 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099666 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C01B7/07 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
C01B7/0712 (EP);
B01D3/14 (KR);
B01D3/36 (EP);
C01B7/01 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/07] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Trennung von Chlorwasserstoff und Wasser aus einer wässerigen Chlorwasserstofflösung | [2001/20] | English: | Method for separating hydrogen chloride and water from an aqueous hydrogen chloride solution | [2001/20] | French: | Procédé de séparation de chlorure d' hydrogène et d'eau à partir d' une solution aqueuse de chlorure d' hydrogène | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 04.07.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0504622 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0711728 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * example 1 *; | [D]JPH08225304 (BAYER AG) |