EP1205155 - Rf ablation apparatus with bio battery ablation depth control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engineering & Research Associates, Inc. 100 North Tucson Boulevard Tucson Arizona 86301 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states Engineering & Research Associates, Inc. 100 North Tucson Boulevard Tucson, Arizona 86301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Junius E. 13405 North 24th Lane Phoenix, Arizona 85029 / US | 02 /
He, Ding Sheng 2631 W. Camino de la Caterva Tuscon, Arizona 85742 / US | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Philip John Duval Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Thomas, Philip John Duval Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310004.7 | 10.11.2000 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205155 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP);
A61B2018/00351 (EP);
A61B2018/00577 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | RF-Ablationsgerät mit Ablationstiefenkontrolle mittels einem galvanischen Elementes | [2002/20] | English: | Rf ablation apparatus with bio battery ablation depth control | [2002/20] | French: | Appareil d'ablation R.F. à contrôle de profondeur d'ablation par piles biologiques | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/47] | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6039731 (TAYLOR JUNIUS E [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * |