EP1102160 - Synchronous digital data transmitter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Technology Way Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Technology Way, P.O. Box 9106 Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | ||
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states ANALOG DEVICES, INCORPORATED One Technology Way, P.O. Box 9106 Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silveira, Douglas A. 70 Converse Street Wakefield, Massachusetts 01880 / US | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Jackson, David Spence Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Jackson, David Spence REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310193.8 | 16.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | US19990443700 | 19.11.1999 Original published format: US 443700 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1102160 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1102160 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1102160 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04M11/06, G06F5/06 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
H04L49/9078 (EP,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5674 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/06] | H04L12/56, H04M11/06 | ||
Former IPC [2001/21] | G06F5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/43] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Synchroner Sender von digitalen Daten | [2001/21] | English: | Synchronous digital data transmitter | [2001/21] | French: | Synchrone émetteur de données digitales | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 14.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.08.2006 | DE | 03.11.2006 | GB | 16.11.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/51] | DE | 03.11.2006 | |
GB | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | DE | 03.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5367534 (CHOU WEI-TAI [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,8,9 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 27 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 49 * * claims 1,6 * * figures 1-3 *[A] 5-7; | [YA]US5903612 (VAN DER PUTTEN FRANK OCTAAF [BE], et al) [Y] 1-4,8,9 * column 1, line 10 - line 30 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 42 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 55 * * claims 1,4,6 * * figure 1 * [A] 5-7 |