EP1104152 - A radiotelephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, Graham 5 Martel Close Camberley, Surrey GU15 1QS / GB | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Jones, Kendra Louise, et al Nokia IPR Department, Nokia House, Summit Avenue Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Jones, Kendra Louise, et al Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310382.7 | 22.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | GB19990028083 | 26.11.1999 Original published format: GB 9928083 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1104152 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04Q7/32, H04B1/38 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
H04M1/725 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ein Funkgerät | [2001/22] | English: | A radiotelephone | [2001/22] | French: | Un radiotéléphone | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |