EP1209956 - System and method for producing pulsed monochromatic X-rays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY 405 Kirkland Hall Nashville, TN 37235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Vanderbilt University 405 Kirkland Hall Nashville, TN 37235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carroll, Frank E 1216 Vintage Place Nashville TN 37215 / US | 02 /
Traeger, Robert H 123 Brighton Close Nashville TN 37205 / US | 03 /
Mendenhall, Marcus 2613 Acklen Avenue Nashville TN 37212 / US | 04 /
Waters, James W 789 Goodpasture Terrace Nashville TN 37221 / US | 05 /
Edwards, Glenn 100 Oostig Drive Chapel Hill NC 27514 / US | 06 /
Brau, Charles A. 415 fairfax Avenue Nashville TN37212 / US | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310471.8 | 24.11.2000 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1209956 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H05G2/00 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
G21K1/06 (EP);
H05G2/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/08] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von gepulsten monochromatischen Röntgenstrahlen | [2002/22] | English: | System and method for producing pulsed monochromatic X-rays | [2002/22] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la production de rayons-x monochromatiques pulsés | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 06.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5353291 (SPRANGLE PHILLIP A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10,14,15,17,22,26 * column 2, line 1 - column 5, line 24 * * figure 1 * [Y] 11,23-25,27,28; | [XA]US6035015 (RUTH RONALD D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,13,14,22,26 * figure - * * column 4, line 25 - column 7, line 12 * [A] 4,5,17-19,21,28; | [YA]JPH10162997 ; | [DY]US4598415 (LUCCIO ALFREDO U [US], et al) [DY] 23-25,27,28 * column 9, line 10 - line 16 * * column 11, line 20 - line 33 * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0535905 (NCR INT INC [US]) [A] 21 * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 2 * * figures 3,5 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10162997 A 19980619 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 11 * abstract * [A] 12,16 |