EP1106201 - A needle assembly having an elongate blunting device which allows for venting of air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medex, Inc. 2231 Rutherford Road Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | [2005/16] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | ||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solomon, Donald D. 900 Nottingham Court Southlake, Texas 76092 / US | 02 /
Miller, Michael L. 2626 Scenic Point Trail, Apt. 2431 Arlington, Texas 7006 / US | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310692.9 | 01.12.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | US19990453983 | 02.12.1999 Original published format: US 453983 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1106201 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106201 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
A61M25/0643 (EP);
A61M2005/3212 (EP);
A61M25/0693 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/10] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Nadelanordnung mit einer länglichen Stumpfmachvorrichtung mit Entlüftungsmöglichkeit | [2001/24] | English: | A needle assembly having an elongate blunting device which allows for venting of air | [2001/24] | French: | Ensemble à aiguille doté d'un dispositif pour émousser la pointe permettant de purger l'air | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 21.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5743882 (LUTHER RONALD B [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 43 - line 64 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]US5749857 (CUPPY MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 53 - line 65 ** figures 2,15 *; | [A]US5951520 (BURZYNSKI MARK J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 10, line 15 - line 22 * * figures 3,4 * |