EP1106391 - Pneumatic tyre [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2006/26] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku# Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Akio, c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd 6-9, 3-chome Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/24] | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey Technical, Dunlop Tyres Ltd., Fort Dunlop Erdington, Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310794.3 | 05.12.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | JP19990346687 | 06.12.1999 Original published format: JP 34668799 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1106391 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1106391 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106391 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/03, B60C11/13, B60C11/12, B60C11/11 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
B60C11/0318 (EP,US);
B60C11/11 (EP,US);
B60C11/1263 (EP,US);
B60C11/13 (EP,US);
B60C11/1384 (EP,US);
B60C2011/1268 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/35] | B60C11/03, B60C11/13, B60C11/12, B60C11/11, // B60C107:00 | ||
Former IPC [2001/24] | B60C11/03, B60C11/13, B60C11/12, // B60C107:00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/21] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Luftreifen | [2001/24] | English: | Pneumatic tyre | [2001/24] | French: | Bandage pneumatique | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 16.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0428472 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4232308 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [A]US5759313 (SHIRAI KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0857588 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 33 - line 42 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0858917 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 45 * * figure 2 * |