EP1106238 - Process for the removal of nitrogen oxides from gas streams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue, Murray Hill New Providence, NJ 07974-2082 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states THE BOC GROUP, INC. 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Providence, New Jersey 07974-2082 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hwang, Shuen-Cheng 3 Chestnut Drive Chester, NJ 07930 / US | 02 /
Anderson, Mark Harper 1033 Powder Mill Road Bethlehem, Pennsylvania 18017 / US | 03 /
Jain, Ravi 15 Moray Avenue Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 04 /
Saxena, Neeraj 40 Salem Road New Providence, NJ 07974 / US | 05 /
Tseng, James Kuo-Feng 30 Shady Grove Lane Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US | 06 /
Workosky, Robert Francis 5544 Princeton Road Macungie, Pennsylvania 18062 / US | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Wickham, Michael, et al C/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Wickham, Michael, et al c/o Patent and Trademark Department The BOC Group plc Chertsey Road Windlesham Surrey GU20 6HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310802.4 | 05.12.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | US19990457778 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: US 457778 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1106238 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/56, B01D53/60 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
B01D53/04 (EP,US);
B01D53/56 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2253/106 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2256/14 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40083 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/10] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Stickstoffoxiden aus einem Gasstrom | [2001/24] | English: | Process for the removal of nitrogen oxides from gas streams | [2001/24] | French: | Procédé d'élimination des oxydes d'azote d'un courant gazeux | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 09.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4863497 (GRENIER MAURICE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-11 * column 1, line 7 - line 12 * * column 2, line 45 - line 64; figures 1,8-10; claims 1,2 *; | [DY]US5206002 (SKELLEY ARTHUR P [US], et al) [DY] 1-11 * column 1, line 7 - line 14 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 15 * * column 6, line 37 - line 59 *; | [Y]EP0876994 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [Y] 4 * page 2, line 3 - line 11 ** page 2, line 31 - line 38 * |