EP1106396 - Pneumatic tyre [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2007/07] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku# Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Akio, c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9, 3-chome Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/24] | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey Technical, Dunlop Tyres Ltd., Fort Dunlop Erdington, Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310825.5 | 06.12.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | JP19990348064 | 07.12.1999 Original published format: JP 34806499 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1106396 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1106396 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106396 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60C13/02 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
B60C13/02 (EP,US);
B60C13/001 (EP,US);
B29D2030/0617 (EP,US);
Y10S425/812 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10819 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/19] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Luftreifen | [2001/24] | English: | Pneumatic tyre | [2001/24] | French: | Bandage pneumatique | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6181207 ; | [A]GB207156 (GOODRICH CO B F) [A] 1,4 * page 1, line 58 - line 80 ** figure - *; | [X]FR1138358 (GEN TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1,3 * page 4 - page 5 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US4343342 (MCDONALD PETER) [A] 1,4 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860829), vol. 010, no. 253, Database accession no. (M - 512), & JP61081207 A 19860424 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [X] 1 * abstract * |