EP1126593 - Controller for power supply and method of operation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
He, Jin 2209 Micarta Drive Planor, Texas 75025 / US | 02 /
Jacobs, Mark E. 7615 Applecross Lane Dallas, Texas 75248 / US | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310938.6 | 08.12.2000 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | US19990469693 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: US 469693 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1126593 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/5387 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
H02M7/5387 (EP,US);
H02M7/53878 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Regler zur Steuerung einer Stromversorgung und Verfahren zu dessen Verwendung | [2001/34] | English: | Controller for power supply and method of operation thereof | [2001/34] | French: | Régulateur destiné au réglage d'une alimentation de puissance et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |