EP1150272 - Method for driving an AC type plasma display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 1815-1, Ohaza Tajiri Kunitomi-cho Higashimorokata-gun Miyazaki 880-1194 / JP | [2008/39] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited Kanagawa Science Park, 3-2-1 Sakado, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 213-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otsuka, Akira, Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Takashi Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki / JP | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310943.6 | 08.12.2000 | [2001/44] | Priority number, date | JP20000123583 | 25.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000123583 | [2001/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1150272 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1150272 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/28 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
G09G3/2022 (EP,US);
G09G3/2927 (EP,US);
G09G3/293 (EP,US);
G09G3/2942 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0218 (EP,US);
G09G2310/066 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/31] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ansteuerung einer Wechselstrom-Plasma-Anzeige | [2008/41] | English: | Method for driving an AC type plasma display panel | [2001/44] | French: | Méthode de commande d'un panneau d'affichage à plasma à courant alternatif | [2001/44] |
Former [2001/44] | Verfahren zur Ansteuerung einer Wechselstrom-Plasma-Anzeigetafel | Examination procedure | 07.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0834856 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 8 * abstract ** page 3, line 51 - page 4, line 4; figure 7 *; | [Y]FR2755281 (SOOSAN HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 5,9 * abstract * * page 8, line 31 - page 9 * * page 13, line 4 - line 16 * * page 17, line 7 - page 18, line 18; figures 7,8 *; | [XAY]EP0959451 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * abstract * * column 8, line 49 - column 9, line 5 * * column 16, line 33 - line 47; figures 4,16 * [A] 7,8,10 [Y] 5,9 |