EP1111774 - Method and apparatus for biasing radio frequency power transistors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grundlingh, Johan M. 5313 Carp, RR Appt. 2 Kinburn, Ontario K0A 2H0 / CA | 02 /
Leroux, Robert 2070 Navahoe Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2C 0V4 / CA | 03 /
Ilowski, John J. 30 Cleadon Drive Nepean, Ontario K2H 5P3 / CA | 04 /
Smiley, Russell C. 44 Boulder Way Neapean, Ontario K2J 4R6 / CA | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Scott & York Intelleczual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2001/26] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Herts. AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311069.9 | 12.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | US19990469222 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: US 469222 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1111774 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/56, H03F3/193 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
H03F1/30 (EP,US);
H03F1/565 (EP,US);
H03F3/193 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/12] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vorspannung von Hochfrequenzleistungstransistoren | [2001/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for biasing radio frequency power transistors | [2001/26] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la polarisation de transistors de puissance haute fréquence | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 17.02.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5117203 (TENNYSON WILLIAM R [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 51 - column 5, line 38; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0715404 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * column W *; | [X]GB2332797 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 2-5* page 3, line 16 - page 6, line 30; figure 3 * |