blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1111529

EP1111529 - Method and apparatus for obtaining components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.07.2007  [2007/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]For all designated states
UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Brodersen, Andrew N., Jr.
340 Cassidy Hill Road
Coventry, Connecticut 06238 / US
 [2001/26]
Representative(s)Samuels, Adrian James
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]Samuels, Adrian James
Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date00311315.618.12.2000
[2001/26]
Priority number, dateUS1999046626217.12.1999         Original published format: US 466262
[2001/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1111529
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1111529
Date:14.04.2004
[2004/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/60
[2001/26]
CPC:
G06Q10/087 (EP); G06Q30/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/26]
TitleGerman:Methode und Vorrichtung zur Lokalisierung von Komponenten[2001/26]
English:Method and apparatus for obtaining components[2001/26]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour obtenir des composants[2001/26]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
05.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/27]
03.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/27]
16.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0697669  (FISHER SCIENTIFIC CO [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 5, line 12 - page 9, line 16 *;
 [A]US5319542  (KING JR JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 3, line 60 - column 6, line 29 *;
 [X]  - BICHLER M ET AL, "A brokerage framework for Internet commerce", DISTRIBUTED AND PARALLEL DATABASES, APRIL 1999, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NETHERLANDS, vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 0926-8782, pages 133 - 148, XP009024821 [X] 1-50 * 1. Introduction and motivation 3. OFFER brokerage project 3.3.2 The catalog aggregation service 3.3.4 The negotiation service *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008702527312
 [X]  - DAOUD F, "Knowledgeable CyberBrokers for electronic markets", PERSONAL TECHNOLOGIES, 1998, SPRINGER-VERLAG, UK, vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 0949-2054, pages 200 - 211, XP001157363 [X] 1-50 * 2. Electronic Commerce Facilitators: E-Brokers 6. E-Broker-Assisted Search in Virtual Catalogues 7.1 Broker-assisted negotiation support *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01321176
 [A]  - KELLER A M ET AL, "MULTI-VENDOR CATALOGS: SMART CATALOGS AND VIRTUAL CATALOGS", EDI FORUM, EDI GROUP, OAK PARK, IL, US, (199609), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 1048-3047, pages 87 - 93, XP001056432 [A] 1-17 * Architecture, p.88-90 Virtual Catalogs, p.90-91;; figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - SUGASAKA T ET AL, "SAGE AND ITS APPLICATION TO ELECTRONIC COMMERCE- SAGE: FRANCIS: A SYSTEM BASED ON VIRTUAL CATALOG", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN, SCRIPTA TECHNICA JOURNALS. NEW YORK, US, (19990615), vol. 30, no. 6, ISSN 0882-1666, pages 36 - 46, XP000832502 [A] 1-17 * 1. Introduction 3. Applied Techniques and Implementation *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-684X(19990615)30:6<36::AID-SCJ4>3.0.CO;2-5
 [A]  - BICHLER M ET AL, "Design and implementation of a brokerage service for electronic procurement", DATABASE AND EXPERT SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS, 1999. PROCEEDINGS. TENTH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON FLORENCE, ITALY 1-3 SEPT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19990901), ISBN 0-7695-0281-4, pages 618 - 622, XP010352449 [A] 18-50 * 2. Negotiations in corporate procurement 3. Architecture of the OFFER Brokerage Service *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.