EP1111895 - Method and apparatus for adaptive power management in a modem [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St.Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McClennon, Robert Scott 209 Chandler Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2C 0G3 / CA | 02 /
Wingrove, Michael 28 Sheppard's Glen Avenue Kanata, Ontario K2M 2M9 / CA | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311340.4 | 18.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | US19990467768 | 20.12.1999 Original published format: US 467768 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111895 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111895 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111895 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, H04L12/10 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
H04L12/10 (EP,US);
H04M11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/05] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für adaptives Powermanagement in einem Modem | [2001/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for adaptive power management in a modem | [2001/26] | French: | Méthode et appareil adaptatif de gestion de puissance dans un modem | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 14.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 18.12.2006 | FR | 02.01.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2007/51] | GB | 18.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5742514 (BONOLA THOMAS JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1,9,15 * abstract *; column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 28 * [A] 2-8,10-14,16-20; | [Y]US5022071 (MOZER FORREST S [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * column 1, lines 11-21 * * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 36; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5987338 (GIBBONS DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * abstract *; column 2, line 53 - line 67 * * column 6, line 22 - line 43 *; | [A]US4701946 (OLIVA RAYMOND A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 9, line 1 - column 12, line 10 * |