EP1216819 - Embossed sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aeschlimann, Reynald Grande-Rue 8b 2035-Corcelles / CH | 02 /
Lutzig, Bodo Werner Chemin de l'Epignau 6 1373-Charvorney / CH | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311459.2 | 20.12.2000 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216819 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/26, B29C59/04, B65D85/10 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
B32B3/26 (EP,US);
B29C59/046 (EP,US);
B29L2031/722 (EP,US);
B65D85/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24628 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2003/12] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Prägefolie | [2002/26] | English: | Embossed sheet | [2002/26] | French: | Feuille comportant des creux | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/40] | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.02.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.02.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.02.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5367768 ; | [A]US5007271 (BOEGLI KARL [CH]) [A] 6* column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 20 *; | [X]US5834037 (WU SZE TSANG [TW]) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 37 - column 6, line 58 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 30, Database accession no. 1978-54066A, XP002168810 & JPS5367768 A 19780616 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |