EP1111472 - Lithographic apparatus with a position detection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/26] | Position detection system for a lithographic apparatus | ||
[2006/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states ASM LITHOGRAPHY B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castenmiller, Thomas Josephus Maria Sophia van Wurtemberglaan 48 5616 BR Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Ariens, Andreas Bernardus Gerardus Florence Nightingalelaan 19 3527 WE Utrecht / NL | 03 /
Hoeks, Martinus Hendricus Hendricus Evertsenlaan 15 5694 SL Breugel / NL | 04 /
Vogelsang, Patrick David De Klokkenmaker 19 5506 CW Veldhoven / NL | 05 /
Loopstra, Erik Roelof Atlas 7 5591 PJ Heeze / NL | 06 /
Kwan, Yim Bun Patrick Warthelandstrasse 68 73431 Aalen / DE | [2002/22] |
Former [2001/26] | 01 /
Castenmiller, Thomas Josephus Maria Sophia van Wurtemberglaan 48 5616 BR Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
Ariens, Andreas Bernardus Gerardus Florence Nightingalelaan 19 3527 WE Utrecht / NL | |||
03 /
Hoeks, Martinus Hendricus Hendricus Evertsenlaan 15 5694 SL Breugel / NL | |||
04 /
Vogelsang, Patrick David De Klokkenmaker 19 5506 CW Veldhoven / NL | |||
05 /
Loopstra, Erik Roelof Atlas 7 5591 PJ Heeze / NL | |||
06 /
Kwan, Yim Bun Patrick Hierlangerweg 4 81369 Munich / DE | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311469.1 | 20.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | EP19990310407 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: EP 99310407 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111472 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111472 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111472 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03F9/00, G03F7/20 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
G03F9/7015 (EP);
G03F7/70716 (EP);
G03F9/7049 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/26] | G03F7/20, G03F9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/44] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Lithographischer Apparat mit einem System zur Positionsdetektion | [2006/28] | English: | Lithographic apparatus with a position detection system | [2006/28] | French: | Appareil lithographique avec un système de détection de position | [2006/28] |
Former [2001/26] | System zur Positionsdetektion für einen lithographischen Apparat | ||
Former [2001/26] | Position detection system for a lithographic apparatus | ||
Former [2001/26] | Système de détection de position pour appareil lithographique | Examination procedure | 05.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 26.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4676649 (PHILLIPS EDWARD H [US]) [X] 1-4,12,14,15 * column 9, line 20 - column 10, line 2 * * column 14, line 33 - line 52 * * figures 6,17 *; | [X]GB2297875 (SAMSUNG AEROSPACE IND [KR]) [X] 1-3,6,7,12,14,15 * page 5, line 10 - page 9, line 17 * * figures 1,4 *; | [X]GB2162942 (PUTRA SIREGAR NURHAYATI INDRA) [X] 15 * page 1, line 46 - page 6, line 18 * * figure - * |