EP1115045 - A clock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alanara, Seppo 7-11-4 Fukasawa, Setagaya-ku 158-0081 Tokyo / JP | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2001/28] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Nokia IPR Department Nokia House, Summit Avenue, Southwood Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311570.6 | 21.12.2000 | [2001/28] | Priority number, date | GB19990030736 | 29.12.1999 Original published format: GB 9930736 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1115045 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1115045 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G04G3/02, G04G5/00 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
G04G3/02 (EP,US);
G04R20/00 (EP,US);
G04R40/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2007/28] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Uhr | [2001/28] | English: | A clock | [2001/28] | French: | Horloge | [2001/28] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 03.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) SE | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/26] | 18.02.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10160874 ; | [A]US4407589 (DAVIDSON JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, lines 1-37 *; | [Y]US5422863 (MINOWA YOSHIKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 5, lines 6-18 *; | [Y]US5717661 (POULSON T EARL [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, lines 32-64 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10160874 A 19980619 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |