EP1114898 - Refractory ceiling structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubo, Hiroaki 23-24-301, Kugahara 2-chome, Oota-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Togasaki, Takeshi 25-21-1004, Syakujii-chou 3-chome, Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shirai, Seiichiro 272-13, Mukaikogane 1-chome Nagareyama-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Onuki, Toshifumi 5-7-202, Kamijima 5-chome Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 05 /
Sakakura, Masatoshi 175-1-203, Tomitsuka-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2001/28] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311739.7 | 28.12.2000 | [2001/28] | Priority number, date | JP19990373148 | 28.12.1999 Original published format: JP 37314899 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1114898 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1114898 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1114898 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/04, E04B9/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
E04B9/183 (EP);
E04B9/001 (EP);
E04B9/045 (EP);
E04B9/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/28] | E04B9/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/27] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bauweise einer feuerfesten aufgehängten Decke | [2001/28] | English: | Refractory ceiling structure | [2001/28] | French: | Structure de plafond réfractaire | [2001/28] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 23.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.04.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 09.09.2005 | [2006/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0280758 (NOHLEN WOLFGANG) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 7 - line 10; figures 1,5,7 * * column 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * column 5, line 38 - line 51 * * column 6, line 11 - line 28 *; | [XA]DE4036735 (ODENWALD FASERPLATTEN [DE]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - line 55 * * column 4, line 20 * [A] 5; | [X]EP0654566 (KNAUF WESTDEUTSCHE GIPS [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 29; figure - *; | [XA]CH479791 (RIGIPS BAUSTOFFWERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 7 - line 15; figure - * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 6 * [A] |