EP1114603 - Improvements in and/or relating to glove removal and/or glove retention [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stobart, Allan William Low Currigg, Raughton Head, Dalston Carlisle Cumbria CA5 7DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states Stobart, Allan William Low Currigg, Raughton Head, Dalston Carlisle, Cumbria CA5 7DX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Every, David Aidan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Every, David Aidan, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2001/28] | Cardwell, Stuart Martin, et al Roystons Tower Building Water Street Liverpool, L3 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311781.9 | 29.12.2000 | [2001/28] | Priority number, date | GB20000000335 | 08.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0000335 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1114603 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1114603 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47G25/90, A61B19/04 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
A47G25/904 (EP,US);
A61B42/40 (EP,US);
A61B42/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/07] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ausziehen und/oder Bewahren von Handschuhen | [2001/28] | English: | Improvements in and/or relating to glove removal and/or glove retention | [2001/28] | French: | Retirage et/ou dêpot des gants | [2001/28] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 02.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3695493 (KARR ROBERT J) [X] 1-6,8-11 * figure - *; | [X]DE2652006 (PONCY) [X] 1-3* figure - *; | [X]US4915272 (VLOCK RICHARD S [US]) [X] 1-6,8,10,11 * column 10, line 1 - line 65; figures 1,2,8,9 *; | [X]JPH10203 (YONEZAWA SHIGEMITSU) [X] 1,2,10 * figure - *; | [PX]US6021935 (YONEZAWA NARIMITSU [JP]) [PX] 1,2,10 |