EP1022310 - Ethylene-vinyl alcohol copolymer composition and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema 4-8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states ARKEMA 4-8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux, Hauts-de-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertin, Denis Le Gall Gremonville 76970 Motteville / FR | 02 /
Germain, Yves 3, allée Parc Maubuisson 27470 Serquigny / FR | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Neel, Henry, et al ARKEMA Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 Cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Neel, Henry, et al ARKEMA Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 Cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/30] | Neel, Henry, et al Elf Atochem S.A., DPI, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00400014.7 | 05.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | FR19990000490 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: FR 9900490 | [2000/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022310 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08L29/04, B32B27/30, B65D1/00, // (C08L29/04, 23:04, 51:06) | [2000/30] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/306 (US);
C08L29/04 (EP,US);
B32B2323/046 (US);
B32B2439/60 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L29/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Title | German: | Ethylen-Vinylalkohol-Copolymer-Zusammensetzung und deren Verwendung | [2000/30] | English: | Ethylene-vinyl alcohol copolymer composition and its use | [2000/30] | French: | Composition à base d'un copolymère de l'éthylène et de l'alcool vinylique et son utilisation | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 01.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/38] | Request for further processing for: | 14.09.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0560369 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP]) [DA] 1-7 * example -; claim - *; | JPH05255555 [ ] (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND, JAPAN); | JPH08165397 [ ] (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND); | [A]EP0742236 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [A] 1-7 * page 5, line 49 - page 6, line 44; claim - *; | [A]WO9727259 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-7* example -; claim - *; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19961014), vol. 125, no. 16, Database accession no. 197454, XP002115133 [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940124), vol. 120, no. 4, Database accession no. 32308, XP002115134 [A] 1-7 * abstract * |