EP1086734 - Gas/liquid separation system in a hydrocarbon conversion process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2008/12] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boyer, Christophe Demeurant 66, rue des Gobins 69390 Charly / FR | 02 /
Koudil, Abdelhakim Demeurant 9, rue du Garet 69001 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Gauthier, Thiérry 108, avenue Casino 69890 La Tour de Salvagnie / FR | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/51] |
Former [2001/13] | Andréeff, François, et al Département Brevets, Institut Français du Petrole, 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 00400065.9 | 12.01.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | FR19990012034 | 24.09.1999 Original published format: FR 9912034 | [2001/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086734 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086734 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D19/00, C10G49/22, B01D45/12, B01D53/26 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
C10G49/007 (EP,US);
B01D19/0057 (EP,US);
B01D45/12 (EP,US);
C10G49/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [2001/51] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gas/Flüssigkeits-Trennungssystem in einem Verfahren zur Umsetzung von Kohlenwasserstoffen | [2007/35] | English: | Gas/liquid separation system in a hydrocarbon conversion process | [2001/13] | French: | Système de séparation gaz/liquide intervenant dans un procédé de conversion d'hydrocarbures | [2007/35] |
Former [2001/13] | Gas-/Flüssigkeits-Trennungssystem in einem Verfahren zur Umsetzung von Kohlenwasserstoffen | ||
Former [2001/13] | Systeme de separation gaz/liquide intervenant dans un procede de conversion d'hydrocarbures | Examination procedure | 28.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 13.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2036606 (PLENTY GROUP LTD) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2284165 (WINTON EUROTECH LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1,5 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE1258393 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 26; figure . *; | [A]EP0085206 (CHANG YING CHUNG) [A] 1,5 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5624642 (DEVANATHAN NARASIMHAN [US], et al); | [A]US4354852 (KYDD PAUL H) |