EP1035087 - Thermally protective coating composition of the ablative type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etat Français représenté par le Délégué Général pour l' Armement "La Rotonde", 26, boulevard Victor 00457 Armées / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states Etat Français représenté par le Délégué Général pour l' Armement "La Rotonde", 26, boulevard Victor 00457 Armées / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cambon, Christian 38, Place du Pressoir 83110 Sanary/Mer / FR | [2000/37] | Application number, filing date | 00400591.4 | 06.03.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2002/14] |
Former [2000/37] | FR19990002793 | 05.03.1999 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035087 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035087 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/04, C04B40/06 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B40/065 (EP);
C04B2111/00482 (EP);
C04B2111/28 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/24, C04B14/30, C04B14/305, C04B14/308, C04B14/42, C04B20/006, C04B22/0013, C04B24/2641, C04B24/2682, C04B24/42, C04B40/065 (EP);
C04B28/02, C04B14/30, C04B14/301, C04B14/305, C04B14/308, C04B14/42, C04B16/0691, C04B22/0013, C04B24/2682, C04B24/30, C04B24/42, C04B40/065 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | Thermisch schützende Beschichtungszusammensetzung des ablativen Typs | [2000/37] | English: | Thermally protective coating composition of the ablative type | [2000/37] | French: | Composition de revêtement de protection thermique de type ablatif | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 10.11.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 30.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2002 | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2003 | CY | 23.07.2003 | FI | 23.07.2003 | IE | 23.07.2003 | NL | 23.07.2003 | DK | 23.10.2003 | GR | 23.10.2003 | PT | 23.12.2003 | LU | 06.03.2004 | BE | 31.03.2004 | CH | 31.03.2004 | LI | 31.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
LU | 06.03.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
PT | 23.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 23.07.2003 | |
FI | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 23.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4595714 (MCALLISTER LAWRENCE E [US], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1182128 (DOW CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1,2 * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 5 * * examples I,IV,V,VI * * claims 1,7 *; | [A]US4086200 (LAMORIA LZ F, et al) [A] 1,2 * example .; claims 1,7 *; | [A]GB970334 (ICI LTD) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 1 - line 3 * * table 1 * * claims 1,2,5 *; | [A]DE4213637 (DOW CORNING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]FR2488874 (RESAPA SA [LU]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 2 - line 4 * * page 1, line 28 - page 3, line 11 *; | [A]US4500674 (FONTANA JACK J [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |