19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
22.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
08.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |
18.02.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
11.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
28.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
28.05.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] |
13.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] |
06.02.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
30.01.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] |
06.06.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] |
31.05.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
31.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.05.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
30.11.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.09.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.05.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
17.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.04.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
15.02.2002 |
Change - priority |
published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] |
13.02.2002 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
09.08.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
13.04.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |
28.11.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
28.07.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] |
28.07.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] |