EP1132349 - Erbium-doped multicomponent glasses manufactured by the sol-gel method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prassas, Michel Corning Incorporated, Pat. dept., SP TI 3-1 Corning, NY 14831 / US | 02 /
Waku, Jean Corning Inc., Pat. dept., SP TI 3-1 Corning, NY 14831 / US | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00400693.8 | 10.03.2000 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1132349 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03C1/00, C03C3/06, C03C3/095, C03C3/102, C03C4/12, C03C13/04 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
C03C1/006 (EP,US);
C03B19/12 (EP,US);
C03C13/046 (EP,US);
C03C3/06 (EP,US);
C03C3/095 (EP,US);
C03B2201/30 (EP,US);
C03B2201/36 (EP,US);
C03B2201/42 (EP,US);
C03B2201/50 (EP,US);
C03B2201/54 (EP,US);
C03C2201/31 (EP,US);
C03C2201/36 (EP,US);
C03C2201/42 (EP,US);
C03C2201/50 (EP,US);
C03C2201/54 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/23] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Durch Sol-Gel Verfahren hergestellte Erbium dotierte Mehrkomponentengläser | [2001/37] | English: | Erbium-doped multicomponent glasses manufactured by the sol-gel method | [2001/37] | French: | Verres à composants multiples dopés à l'erbium préparés par le procédé sol-gel | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0565277 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-31 * example 10 *; | [A]EP0565439 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [A] 31 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH07109147 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-31 * examples 1,3,5-7,9,10,13 * * Comparative example 1 *; | [A]JPH04280834 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-31 * example - * |