EP1052004 - Process and apparatus for concentrating waste water by accelerated evaporation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | For all designated states Nucleos France 10 rue des Ecouffes 75004 Paris / FR | [2006/24] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states Nucleos France 10 rue des Ecouffes 75004 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stock, Philippe 9, rue du Dragon 75006 Paris / FR | 02 /
Bocard, Christian 11, rue Maurice Berteaux 78112 Fourqueux / FR | 03 /
Canal, Philippe 10, rue des Ecouffes 75004 Paris / FR | [2000/46] | Application number, filing date | 00400944.5 | 06.04.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | FR19990006145 | 12.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9906145 | [2000/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052004 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/46] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1052004 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | [2003/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052004 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/34, B01D1/14 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
B01D3/346 (EP);
B01D1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Konzentrierung von Abwasser durch beschleunigte Verdampfung | [2000/46] | English: | Process and apparatus for concentrating waste water by accelerated evaporation | [2000/46] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la concentration par évaporation accélérée de rejets aqueux | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 29.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2006 | CY | 14.06.2006 | FI | 14.06.2006 | GB | 14.06.2006 | NL | 14.06.2006 | DK | 14.09.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | DE | 15.09.2006 | GR | 15.09.2006 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
DE | 15.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
DE | 15.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
DE | 15.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 14.06.2006 | |
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS61274701 ; | [A]GB658286 (NORMAN SWINDIN) [A] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2298359 (BERTIN & CIE [FR]) [Y] 1,6,7 * page 1, line 22 - line 32 * * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]US4104112 (STUTZ ROBERT C) [A] 1,4,7,8* figure - *; | [A]DE2706430 (KRAGH LOREN GEORGE) [A] 1,4,7,8 * figure - *; | [A]WO8304185 (VICO KEMISK TEKNISKA FAB [SE]) [A] 1,5,13 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2143144 (OSHITARI YOSHIMI) [A] 1,4,7,8 * figure - *; | [A]WO9823349 (DUIJN ALBERT VAN [NL]) [A] 1,4,7,8 * figure - * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870430), vol. 011, no. 136, Database accession no. (C - 419), & JP61274701 A 19861204 (KENICHI NAKAGAWA) [Y] 1,6,7 * abstract * [A] 4,8 |