EP1043444 - Finishing agent for textile comprising urethane-alkylene oxide copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Protex 6 rue Barbès 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | [2000/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durand, Frédéric Pierre-Marie 60 Allée François 1er 41000 Blois / FR | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Colas, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Colas, Jean-Pierre Cabinet de Boisse et Colas 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00400969.2 | 07.04.2000 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | FR19990004323 | 07.04.1999 Original published format: FR 9904323 | [2000/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1043444 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1043444 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/568 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
D06M15/568 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | Textilveredlungsmittel auf der Basis von Urethan-Alkylenoxidcopolymeren | [2007/34] | English: | Finishing agent for textile comprising urethane-alkylene oxide copolymers | [2000/41] | French: | Agents de finissage pour matériaux textiles constitués de copolymères uréthane-oxyalcoylène | [2000/41] |
Former [2000/41] | Textilveredlungsmittel auf der Basis von Urethane-Alkylenoxidcopolymeren | Examination procedure | 03.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2008 | CY | 16.01.2008 | DK | 16.01.2008 | FI | 16.01.2008 | GB | 16.01.2008 | IE | 16.01.2008 | IT | 16.01.2008 | NL | 16.01.2008 | LU | 07.04.2008 | SE | 16.04.2008 | DE | 17.04.2008 | GR | 17.04.2008 | ES | 27.04.2008 | BE | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | PT | 16.06.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
LU | 07.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
BE | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
GB | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DE | 17.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | NL | 16.01.2008 | |
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 16.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH389566 (DEERING MILLIKEN RES CORP [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]BE831629 (MANUFACTURE DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES PROTEX) [X] 1-3,6,9 * page 2, line 7 - line 14 * * page 5, line 39 - page 7, line 30 *; | [D]FR2280644 (PROTEX MANUF PROD CHIMIQ [FR]); | [X]US4164535 (VEAUTE GEORGES [FR]) [X] 1-3,6,9 * column W *; | [A]EP0445077 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5692936 (YAMAGUCHI MUNEHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 65 - line 67 * |