Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
10.01.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.07.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
12.05.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.08.2004 | Change - representative | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
11.05.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.10.2003 | Change - applicant | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
10.10.2003 | Change - representative | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
15.05.2003 | Renewal fee | |
28.03.2003 | Change - applicant | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
10.04.2002 | Renewal fee | |
25.09.2001 | Change - extension states | |
18.05.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] |
05.05.2001 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] |
01.09.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] |