EP1045524 - Low power radio receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S. 42, rue Le Corbusier - Europarc 94042 Créteil Cédex / FR | [2003/48] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Valeo Securité Habitacle 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc 94042 Créteil / FR | ||
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states Valeo Electronique 2 rue Fernand Pouillon, Z.I. Europarc 94042 Créteil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Courjault, Gilles 66 rue Mendès France 78114 Magny les Hameaux / FR | 02 /
Farine, Hervé 11 avenue des Sorbiers 94210 La Varenne st. Hilaire / FR | 03 /
Belinguier, Thierry 18 avenue de Verdun 94410 Saint-Maurice / FR | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Rosolen-Delarue, Katell Valeo Securité Habitacle Service Propriété Industrielle 42 Rue Le Corbusier Europarc 94042 Créteil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Rosolen-Delarue, Katell Valeo Securité Habitacle, Service Propriété Industrielle, 42, rue Le Corbusier - Europarc 94042 Creteil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/48] | Hervouet, Sylvie, et al Valeo Sécurité Habitacle S.A.S. 42, rue Le Corbusier Europarc 94042 Créteil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401010.4 | 12.04.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | FR19990004649 | 14.04.1999 Original published format: FR 9904649 | [2000/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045524 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/30, H03D11/00 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
H04B1/30 (EP);
H03D11/04 (EP);
H04B14/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2001/27] |
Former [2000/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Funkempfänger mit niedrigen Leistungsaufnahme | [2000/42] | English: | Low power radio receiver | [2000/42] | French: | Récepteur radio-fréquence basse consommation | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 16.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4393514 (MINAKUCHI YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 16; figure 3 *; | [A]US4786903 (GRINDAHL MERVIN L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]US5630216 (MCEWAN THOMAS E [US]) [A] 1-4,10 * column 1, line 14 - column 5, line 34; figures 1,2 * |