Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1052191
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.10.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
30.06.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.06.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.12.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.07.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.05.2002 |
First examination report |
|
30.04.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.10.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
15.06.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] |
29.09.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |
29.09.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |