EP1052191 - Container fitted with a dispensing head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baudin, Gilles 11 rue de l'Ouest 95330 Domont / FR | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Leszczynski, André NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401215.9 | 03.05.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | FR19990005695 | 05.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9905695 | [2000/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052191 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/34, B05B1/32, B65D83/16 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
B65D83/20 (EP,US);
B05B1/3436 (EP,US);
B05B15/528 (EP,US);
B65D83/7535 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7881 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | Behälter mit einem Ausgabekopf | [2000/46] | English: | Container fitted with a dispensing head | [2000/46] | French: | Récipient équipé d'une tête de distribution | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/51] | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1636314 (MURRAY JOHN D) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 50 - page 2, line 7; figures 1-4,7,8 *; | [Y]FR2284533 (BLENDAX WERKE SCHNEIDER CO [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 2; figures 2,4 *; | [A]US4884750 (WERDING WINFRIED [CH]) [A] 7-9 * column 2, line 16 - line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US5186368 (GARCIA FIRMIN [FR]) [X] 1,3,11-13 * column 5, line 20 - line 36 * * column 6, line 28 - line 54; figure 5 * [Y] 5,6; | [A]FR2708908 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 7-10* page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 8; figures 1,2 * | Examination | FR1539302 | by applicant | US3250474 |