Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000329527 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14026999 | 20.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1055904 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2001 | A3 | EP1055904 | 29.11.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP14026999 | 20.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6330066 | 11.12.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP14026999 | 20.05.1999 |