EP1055904 - Height measuring apparatus and method and testing apparatus using the height measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Minoru, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Kuniyoshi, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401409.8 | 22.05.2000 | [2000/48] | Priority number, date | JP19990140269 | 20.05.1999 Original published format: JP 14026999 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1055904 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1055904 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/06, G01B11/24 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
G01B11/0608 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/48] | G01B11/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/03] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zur Höhenmessung und Prüfapparat unter Verwendung des Höhenmessapparats | [2000/48] | English: | Height measuring apparatus and method and testing apparatus using the height measuring apparatus | [2000/48] | French: | Appareil et procédé de mesure de la hauteur et appareil d' essai utilisant l' appareil de mesure de la hauteur | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 26.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5151609 (NAKAGAWA YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 3 - column 8; figure 1 *; | [A]US5780866 (YAMAMURA HISAE [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,5* abstract * |