EP1070539 - Adsorbent with improved selectivity for separating gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lledos, Bernard 48, rue Hyppolite Thaine 78280 Guyancourt / FR | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2001/04] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'Air Liquide S.A., DSPI, Service Brevets et Marques, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401630.9 | 08.06.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | FR19990009516 | 22.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909516 | [2001/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070539 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/18, B01D53/04, B01D53/047 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
B01J20/183 (EP,US);
B01J20/186 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2253/308 (EP,US);
B01D2256/10 (EP,US);
B01D2256/16 (EP,US);
B01D2256/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | Adsorptionsmittel mit verbesserter Selektivität zur Gastrennung | [2001/04] | English: | Adsorbent with improved selectivity for separating gases | [2001/04] | French: | Adsorbant à sélectivité améliorée pour la séparation des gaz | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB824825 (BATAAFSCHE PETROLEUM) [A] 1,2,5 * page 3, line 116 - line 118 *; | [A]US3140933 (MCKEE DOUGLAS W); | [A]GB976023 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [A] 1,2,5,9-12 * page 2, line 41 - line 50 * * page 3, line 68 - line 72 *; | [A]US4775396 (RASTELLI HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6-11,13 * column 5, line 12 - line 29; claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP0297542 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1,4-12 * page 3, line 1 - line 13 * * page 4, line 7 - line 20 *; | [A]US5246689 (BECK JEFFREY S [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * column 1, line 16 - line 18 * * column 25, line 65 - line 70 *; | [A]US5378440 (HERBST JOSEPH A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6 * column 14, line 61 - column 15, line 31 * * column 24, line 33 - line 45 *; | [A]EP0685258 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,2 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]US5559070 (TORII KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5,8 * column 5, line 53 - line 59 * * column 6, line 44 *; | [A]EP0893156 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,4-12 * page 2, line 3 - line 36; claims 1-6 * | Examination | EP0693309 | WO9932404 |