EP1063283 - Cold cleaning microemulsion compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema 4-8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states ARKEMA 4-8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michaud, Pascal 35, boulevard Pasteur 95210 Saint-Gratien / FR | 02 /
Martin, Jean-Jacques 15, avenue Vitel 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | 03 /
Brochette, Pascal 11, rue des Ajoncs d'Or 56200 La Gacilly / FR | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet CHAILLOT, 16-20, avenue de L'Agent Sarre, B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401766.1 | 21.06.2000 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | FR19990007848 | 21.06.1999 Original published format: FR 9907848 | [2000/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063283 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1063283 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D1/12, C11D3/43, C11D3/20, C11D3/18 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
C11D3/43 (EP,US);
C11D1/12 (KR);
C11D1/123 (EP,US);
C11D17/0021 (EP,US);
C11D3/18 (EP,US);
C11D3/2003 (EP,US);
C11D3/2068 (EP,US);
C11D3/2072 (EP,US);
C11D3/2093 (EP,US);
H05K3/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | Kaltreiniger in Form einer Mikroemulsion | [2000/52] | English: | Cold cleaning microemulsion compositions | [2000/52] | French: | Compositions de nettoyage à froid du type microémulsions | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 03.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 19.08.2003 | Appeal received | 20.10.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.11.2003 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2004 | FI | 22.12.2004 | GB | 22.12.2004 | IE | 22.12.2004 | IT | 22.12.2004 | NL | 22.12.2004 | DK | 22.03.2005 | GR | 22.03.2005 | SE | 22.03.2005 | DE | 23.03.2005 | ES | 02.04.2005 | PT | 22.05.2005 | CY | 21.06.2005 | LU | 21.06.2005 | BE | 30.06.2005 | CH | 30.06.2005 | LI | 30.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
IT | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
SE | 22.03.2005 | ||
DE | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
CY | 21.06.2005 | ||
LU | 21.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
SE | 22.03.2005 | ||
DE | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
CY | 21.06.2005 | ||
LU | 21.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
SE | 22.03.2005 | ||
DE | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
CY | 21.06.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
SE | 22.03.2005 | ||
DE | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
DE | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
CH | 30.06.2005 | ||
LI | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
DE | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
DE | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
NL | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
DE | 23.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
DK | 22.03.2005 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
ES | 02.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 22.12.2004 | |
FI | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 22.12.2004 | |
GR | 22.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 22.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2119274 (MELLE BEZONS) [A] 1 * examples 32,33 *; | [XA]EP0216355 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [X] 1,3,9 * examples 1A-C,2A,3B,4A,5A,6AB,7A,8A; claims 1-10 * [A] 4; | [A]EP0418986 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-4* claims 1-23 *; | [X]WO9906520 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,2 * example 5; claim 1 * |