EP1069397 - Displacement sensor for servo-controlled jacks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Actuation Systems SAS 106, rue Fourny 78530 Buc / FR | [2013/09] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states TRW Systemes Aeronautiques Civils ZI du Vert Galant, 7/9 Av. de l'Eguillette 95310 St Ouen l'Aumone / FR | ||
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Lucas Aerospace Fcs ZI du Vert Galant, 7/9 Av. de l'Eguillette 95310 St Ouen l'Aumone / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vaslin, Jean-Philippe 30ter rue Semeraire 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | 02 /
Roy, Alain 34, rue Paul Cezanne 95440 Ecouen / FR | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/43] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2009/49] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2007/26] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2001/03] | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402023.6 | 13.07.2000 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | FR19990009241 | 16.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909241 | [2001/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1069397 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1069397 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/00, B64C13/24, G01D5/22, F15B15/28 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
F15B15/2815 (EP,US);
G01D18/00 (EP,US);
G01D5/2291 (EP,US);
B64C13/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/03] | G01B5/00, G01B7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/40] |
Former [2001/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bewegungssensor für Schraubenwinde mit Servosteuerung | [2001/03] | English: | Displacement sensor for servo-controlled jacks | [2001/03] | French: | Capteur de déplacement pour verins de servo-commande | [2001/03] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10170209 ; | [A]US5063687 (OLSHEFSKY FRANK A [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 4 - column 8 *; | [A]DE4017715 (DISKUS WERKE FRANKFURT MAIN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 2 *; | [A]US5263556 (FRANIA JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5 - column 7 *; | [A]US5740782 (LOWI JR ALVIN [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 6 - column 12 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10170209 A 19980626 (TAMAGAWA SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US4292740 | US4422341 | DE3826184 | US5477771 |