EP1072486 - Steering column for vehicles with clamping sleeve as anti theft protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECIA INDUSTRIE 276, Rue Louis Blériot 92100 Boulogne / FR | [2001/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perrot, Gérard 6, allée des Cèdres, Mathay 25700 Valentigney / FR | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Habasque, Etienne Joel Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402072.3 | 20.07.2000 | [2001/05] | Priority number, date | FR19990009742 | 27.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909742 | [2001/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1072486 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/02 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
B60R25/02107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/42] |
Former [2001/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lenksäule für Kraftfahrzeuge mit Feststellhülse zur Diebstahlsicherung | [2001/05] | English: | Steering column for vehicles with clamping sleeve as anti theft protection | [2001/05] | French: | Arbre de direction de véhicule automobile équipé d'un manchon antivol débrayable | [2001/05] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 27.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0569269 (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 4, line 43 - line 53 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO9626852 (TORRINGTON CO [GB]) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 5 * * page 3, line 9 - line 13 * * figure 1 * |