EP1073121 - Semiconductor memory device and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Hiroshi, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402175.4 | 28.07.2000 | [2001/05] | Priority number, date | JP19990215601 | 29.07.1999 Original published format: JP 21560199 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1073121 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1073121 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115, H01L21/8247 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
H10B69/00 (EP,US);
H01L27/10 (KR);
H10B41/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/30] |
Former [2001/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicherbauelement und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [2001/05] | English: | Semiconductor memory device and method for manufacturing the same | [2001/05] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteur et son procédé de fabrication | [2001/05] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 29.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/30] | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3171664 ; | [A]US5270240 (LEE ROGER R [US]); | [YA]EP0712163 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [XY]US5679591 (LIN RUEI-LING [TW], et al) |