EP1086976 - Process for preparing microgels of controlled size [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue du Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chauveteau, Guy 34 rue Salvador Allende 92000 Nanterre / FR | 02 /
Tabary, René 17, rue Danês de Montardat 78100 Saint-Germain-En-Laye / FR | 03 /
Renard, Michel 2, avenue des Milles Feuilles 95640 Marines / FR | 04 /
Omari, Aziz 13, rue des Etourneaux 33600 Pessac / FR | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/51] |
Former [2001/13] | Coadour, Jean Institut Français du Pétrole, 1 et 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402238.0 | 07.08.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | FR19990011862 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: FR 9911862 | [2001/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086976 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086976 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/075, E21B33/138, E21B43/25, E21B43/02 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
C09K8/887 (EP,US);
C08J3/075 (EP,US);
C09K8/512 (EP,US);
C09K8/5756 (EP,US);
Y10S507/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IT, NL [2001/51] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mikrogelen mit kontrollierter Teilchengrösse | [2001/13] | English: | Process for preparing microgels of controlled size | [2001/13] | French: | Méthode de préparation de microgels de taille contrôlée | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4670165 (BLACK ROBERT H [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,7,9 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 60 ** column 9, line 48 - column 10, line 55 *; | [Y]EP0604988 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [Y] 1-4,6-9 * page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 53 * * page 4, line 30 - line 42; example I *; | [Y]US5642783 (MORADI-ARAGHI AHMAD [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-9 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 51 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 32; example 1 *; | [Y]US5789351 (AHMED IQBAL [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-9 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 53 * * column 4, line 43 - line 34 * * column 6, line 1 - line 30; example 1 * |