Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001158715 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9913150 | 21.10.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1093844 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9913150 | 21.10.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2799989 | 19.04.2002 | B1 | FR2799989 | 27.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9913150 | 21.10.1999 |