EP1093844 - Emulsifying system for water-in-oil emulsion and its use especially in cosmetics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorant, Raluca 35 rue des Eglantiers 94320 Thiais / FR | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Rasson, Catherine L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Rasson, Catherine L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402370.1 | 28.08.2000 | [2001/17] | Priority number, date | FR19990013150 | 21.10.1999 Original published format: FR 9913150 | [2001/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093844 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01F17/56, B01F17/54, A61K7/48, A61K7/06, A61K7/02, A61K9/107, B01F17/00 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K8/064 (EP);
A61K8/604 (EP);
A61K8/894 (EP);
A61Q1/02 (EP);
A61Q1/14 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61Q19/005 (EP);
A61Q19/007 (EP);
C09K23/017 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | Emulgiermittel für eine Wasser-in-Öl Emulsion und deren Verwendung insbesondere in Kosmetika | [2001/17] | English: | Emulsifying system for water-in-oil emulsion and its use especially in cosmetics | [2001/17] | French: | Système émulsionnant pour une émulsion eau-dans-huile et ses utitilisations notamment dans le domaine cosmétique | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 16.12.2002 | New documents discovered [2003/05] | 02.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0643961 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,3-6 * claims 1-19 * |