EP1187115 - Optical storage device with integrated cleaner for the optical pick-up [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing SA 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, Quai A. le Galo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borgonovo, Alberto Flat 9E, Blessings Garden, 95, Robinson Road Hong Kong / CN | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Rossmanith, Manfred, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 00402505.2 | 12.09.2000 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1187115 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/12, G11B17/04 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
G11B17/051 (EP);
G11B7/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/49] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur optischen Wiedergabe und/oder Aufzeichnung von Daten mit integrierter Putzvorrichtung für den optischen Kopf | [2002/11] | English: | Optical storage device with integrated cleaner for the optical pick-up | [2002/11] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et/ou de lecture optique avec système de nettoyage de la tête optique | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/39] | 19.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.10.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.10.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02216628 ; | [X]JPH0612693 ; | [X]US5220552 (YOKOI CHIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]JPH07201061 ; | [X]JPH033180 ; | [X]JPH02105340 ; | [X]JPH02273334 ; | [A]JPH06176554 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901115), vol. 014, no. 521, Database accession no. (P - 1131), & JP02216628 A 19900829 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940418), vol. 018, no. 216, Database accession no. (P - 1728), & JP06012693 A 19940121 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07201061 A 19950804 (KYUSHU HITACHI MAXELL LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910319), vol. 015, no. 115, Database accession no. (P - 1181), & JP03003180 A 19910109 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900710), vol. 014, no. 321, Database accession no. (P - 1074), & JP02105340 A 19900417 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910125), vol. 015, no. 033, Database accession no. (P - 1158), & JP02273334 A 19901107 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940929), vol. 018, no. 519, Database accession no. (P - 1807), & JP06176554 A 19940624 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |