EP1085245 - Means for connecting a pipe to a tubular body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEGRIS S.A. 74 rue de Paris F-35000 Rennes / FR | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guivarc'h, Olivier 2 Square du Dauphiné 35000 Rennes / FR | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Robert, Jean-Pierre CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402509.4 | 12.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | FR19990011738 | 20.09.1999 Original published format: FR 9911738 | [2001/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1085245 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1085245 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L19/02 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
F16L19/0231 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | Verbindungsmittel für Anschliessen eines Rohres an röhrenförmigen Körper | [2001/12] | English: | Means for connecting a pipe to a tubular body | [2001/12] | French: | Moyens de connexion d'une canalisation à un corps tubulaire | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.2005 | FI | 09.02.2005 | IE | 09.02.2005 | NL | 09.02.2005 | DK | 09.05.2005 | GR | 09.05.2005 | SE | 09.05.2005 | ES | 20.05.2005 | PT | 09.07.2005 | CY | 12.09.2005 | BE | 30.09.2005 | CH | 30.09.2005 | LI | 30.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
CY | 12.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/42] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
ES | 20.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 09.02.2005 | |
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US1675808 (KLISS CHARLES J) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 6; | [X]US1703696 (WALCOTT STRATFORD CHARLES) [X] 1,2,4,5 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]FR1334545 (RECH S TECH ET IND SOC D) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 45 - line 50 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3-5; | [X]EP0545469 (WEINBERG PIERRE ANDRE [BE]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5348351 (LAFLEUR KARL K [US], et al) [A] 7 * figure 1 ** column 3, line 57 - line 60 * |