Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
15.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
14.01.2003 | Change - extension states | |
04.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
30.10.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
13.09.2002 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
13.09.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] |
28.12.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 13.02.2002 [2002/07] |
28.12.2001 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2002 [2002/07] |
07.12.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.01.2002 [2002/04] |