Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7429200 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0002536 | 14.09.2000 | FR9911564 | 16.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7429100 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0002535 | 14.09.2000 | FR9911564 | 16.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2384768 | 22.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0002536 | 14.09.2000 | FR9911564 | 16.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0119965 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9911564 | 16.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0119964 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9911564 | 16.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1085082 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9911564 | 16.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1085084 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9911564 | 16.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR025693 | 11.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9911564 | 16.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR025694 | 11.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9911564 | 16.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2798671 | 23.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9911564 | 16.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6365405 | 02.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FR9911564 | 16.09.1999 |