EP1092960 - Flowmeter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cran ZI des Guignons 10400 Nogent sur Seine / FR | [2001/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raffort, Joel 17, Boulevard de Dijon 10800 Saint Julien les Villes / FR | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Debay, Yves Cabinet Debay 126 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Debay, Yves Cabinet Debay, 126 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402749.6 | 06.10.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | FR19990012825 | 14.10.1999 Original published format: FR 9912825 | [2001/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092960 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/44, G01F7/00 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
G01F1/44 (EP);
G01F7/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/02] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Durchflussmesser | [2001/16] | English: | Flowmeter | [2001/16] | French: | Débitmètre | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 01.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/46] | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0552916 (PURITAN BENNETT CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 6, line 25 - column 7, line 13 * * column 10, line 51 - column 11, line 8; figures 2,13 * [Y] 11; | [Y]WO9417369 (MIRIS MEDICAL CORP [US]) [Y] 11 * page 17, line 2 - line 14; figure 3 *; | [Y]US5199306 (HUNTER ROBERT M [US]) [Y] 2 * column 6, line 18 - line 43; figure 5 *; | [X]DE3505833 (KRUPP KOPPERS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3 * page 5, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 2; figure . * | [XY] - RIVETTI A ET AL, "LHE VENTURI FLOWMETERS: PRACTICAL DESIGN CRITERIA AND CALIBRATION METHOD", CRYOGENICS,GB,IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS LTD. GUILDFORD, (19940607), vol. 34, no. ICEC-SUPPL, ISSN 0011-2275, pages 449 - 452, XP000511584 [X] 1,3 * page 449, paragraph L - page 450, paragraph 1; figure 1 * [Y] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0011-2275(05)80103-1 | [X] - V.M. LITCHINKO, "LA MESURE DES DÉBITS SANS PERTES DE CHARGE", CHALEUR & INDUSTRIE, (195810), vol. 39, no. 399, pages 243 - 262, XP002142459 [X] 1,3,7 * page 245, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 4; figure 3 * |