EP1093793 - Composition for oxidative dyeing of keratinous fibres and dyeing process using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pastore, Florent 13 rue de la Melonnière 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | 02 /
LaGrange, Alain 7 rue de Montry 77700 Coupvray / FR | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Fevrier, Murielle Françoise E. L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Fevrier, Murielle L'Oreal, DPI, 6 Rue Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402783.5 | 09.10.2000 | [2001/17] | Priority number, date | FR19990013149 | 21.10.1999 Original published format: FR 9913149 | [2001/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1093793 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1093793 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | [2001/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/13 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP);
A61K8/411 (EP);
A61K8/415 (EP);
A61K8/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | Oxidationsfärbemittel für keratinische Fasern und Färbungsverfahren mit diesem Mittel | [2001/17] | English: | Composition for oxidative dyeing of keratinous fibres and dyeing process using same | [2001/17] | French: | Composition de teinture d'oxydation des fibres kératiniques et procédé de teinture mettant en oeuvre cette composition | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 16.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0579204 (KAO CORP [JP]) [DX] 1,2,10 * page 7, line 1 - line 23; claims 1,2; table 2 *; | [A]JPH06116215 ; | [A]EP0410471 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 5,6,8 *; | [A]EP0634163 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,16 * claims 1,17 *; | [A]DE4102907 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,4,5 * claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]DE19607158 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,2,6 * claims 1,7,9 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940726), vol. 018, no. 400, & JP06116215 A 19940426 (KAO) [A] 1 * abstract * |