EP1092542 - Ink jet printer and printing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMAJE S.A. 9, rue Gaspard Monge 26501 Bourg-les-Valence / FR | [2001/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vago, Stéphane 8, rue des Oeillets 26600 Pont de l'Isère / FR | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Brykman, Georges, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Brykman, Georges, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/16] | Brykman, Georges, et al c/o Société de Protection des Inventions, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402817.1 | 12.10.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | FR19990012881 | 15.10.1999 Original published format: FR 9912881 | [2001/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092542 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092542 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/035, B41J2/085, B41J2/105, B41J2/015 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
B41J2/02 (EP);
B41J2/08 (EP);
B41J2/105 (EP);
B41J2002/033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2002/02] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldrucker und Druckverfahren | [2001/16] | English: | Ink jet printer and printing process | [2001/16] | French: | Imprimante et procédé d'impression par jets d'encre | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 19.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 28.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 04.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0949077 (TOXOT SCIENCE & APPL [FR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS57201668 ; | [A]US4638326 (YAMADA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4638328 (DRAKE DONALD J [US], et al) [DA] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4230558 (FULWYLER MACK J) [DA] 1,10 * the whole document * | [A] - DRAKE D J, "BINARY CONTINUOUS THERMAL INK JET BREAK OFF LENGTH MODULATION", XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL,US,XEROX CORPORATION. STAMFORD, CONN, (19890501), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 95 - 100, XP000027460 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830305), vol. 007, no. 055, Database accession no. (M - 198), & JP57201668 A 19821210 (FUJI XEROX KK) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | by applicant | US4220958 | US3596275 | US4638328 | US4230558 |